LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR57
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR57
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR57
Action History
Senate
09/06/2019
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2604.)
Senate
08/29/2019
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2320.) (August 29).
Senate
08/29/2019
Set for hearing August 29.
Senate
08/28/2019
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Senate
08/21/2019
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Senate
08/14/2019
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.