California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR64 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/09/2019

                            Enrolled  September 09, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 64Introduced by Senator Hurtado(Coauthors: Senators Caballero, Durazo, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Leyva, and Rubio)August 28, 2019 Relative to the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 64, Hurtado. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, According to the United Nations, the observance of the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty can be traced back to October 17, 1987; andWHEREAS, On that day, over 100,000 people gathered at the Trocadro in Paris, where the Universal Declaration of Human Rights was signed in 1948, to honor the victims of extreme poverty, violence, and hunger; andWHEREAS, On this day, poverty was proclaimed as a violation of human rights and the need was affirmed to come together to ensure that these rights are respected; andWHEREAS, These convictions are inscribed in a commemorative stone unveiled on this day; andWHEREAS, Since then, people of all backgrounds, beliefs, and social origins have gathered every year on October 17 to renew their commitment and show their solidarity with the poor; andWHEREAS, The United Nations General Assembly declared October 17 as the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty and invited all states to devote the day to presenting and promoting, as appropriate in the national context, concrete activities with regard to the eradication of poverty and destitution; andWHEREAS, October 17 presents an opportunity to acknowledge the effort and struggle of people living in poverty, a chance for them to make their concerns heard, and a moment to recognize that poor people are the first ones to fight against poverty; andWHEREAS, The persistence of poverty, including extreme poverty, is a major concern for the United Nations and, at its 72nd session, the General Assembly launched the Third United Nations Decade for the Eradication of Poverty (20182027); andWHEREAS, Poverty is a problem related not only to financial resources, but also to lack of opportunity; andWHEREAS, Poverty eradication is the first Sustainable Development Goal of the United Nations 2030 Agenda for Sustainable Development; andWHEREAS, Poverty eradication is closely linked to other goals, such as ensuring good health and hygiene conditions, access to quality education for all, opportunities for decent employment, gender equality, and preservation of the environment; andWHEREAS, The State of California recognizes that people must come together to end poverty and discrimination all over the world in order to build a sustainable future in which the needs of the present are met without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes October 17, 2019, as the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty, and urges all Californians to join in service to eradicate poverty in our state and all over the world; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Members of the Legislature and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 09, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 64Introduced by Senator Hurtado(Coauthors: Senators Caballero, Durazo, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Leyva, and Rubio)August 28, 2019 Relative to the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 64, Hurtado. Digest Key

 Enrolled  September 09, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2019

Enrolled  September 09, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 64

Introduced by Senator Hurtado(Coauthors: Senators Caballero, Durazo, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Leyva, and Rubio)August 28, 2019

Introduced by Senator Hurtado(Coauthors: Senators Caballero, Durazo, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Leyva, and Rubio)
August 28, 2019

 Relative to the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 64, Hurtado. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, According to the United Nations, the observance of the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty can be traced back to October 17, 1987; and

WHEREAS, On that day, over 100,000 people gathered at the Trocadro in Paris, where the Universal Declaration of Human Rights was signed in 1948, to honor the victims of extreme poverty, violence, and hunger; and

WHEREAS, On this day, poverty was proclaimed as a violation of human rights and the need was affirmed to come together to ensure that these rights are respected; and

WHEREAS, These convictions are inscribed in a commemorative stone unveiled on this day; and

WHEREAS, Since then, people of all backgrounds, beliefs, and social origins have gathered every year on October 17 to renew their commitment and show their solidarity with the poor; and

WHEREAS, The United Nations General Assembly declared October 17 as the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty and invited all states to devote the day to presenting and promoting, as appropriate in the national context, concrete activities with regard to the eradication of poverty and destitution; and

WHEREAS, October 17 presents an opportunity to acknowledge the effort and struggle of people living in poverty, a chance for them to make their concerns heard, and a moment to recognize that poor people are the first ones to fight against poverty; and

WHEREAS, The persistence of poverty, including extreme poverty, is a major concern for the United Nations and, at its 72nd session, the General Assembly launched the Third United Nations Decade for the Eradication of Poverty (20182027); and

WHEREAS, Poverty is a problem related not only to financial resources, but also to lack of opportunity; and

WHEREAS, Poverty eradication is the first Sustainable Development Goal of the United Nations 2030 Agenda for Sustainable Development; and

WHEREAS, Poverty eradication is closely linked to other goals, such as ensuring good health and hygiene conditions, access to quality education for all, opportunities for decent employment, gender equality, and preservation of the environment; and

WHEREAS, The State of California recognizes that people must come together to end poverty and discrimination all over the world in order to build a sustainable future in which the needs of the present are met without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes October 17, 2019, as the International Day for the Eradication of Poverty, and urges all Californians to join in service to eradicate poverty in our state and all over the world; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Members of the Legislature and to the author for appropriate distribution.