California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR65 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/09/2019

                            Enrolled  September 09, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 65Introduced by Senator JacksonAugust 30, 2019 Relative to pain awareness. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 65, Jackson. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, More than 100 million Americans live with chronic pain caused by various diseases or disorders, and nearly 25 million Americans suffer with acute pain each year; andWHEREAS, Though medical knowledge and technology exist to relieve or greatly ease pain, most pain is untreated, undertreated, or improperly treated, and many health care professionals are still unaware of how to effectively treat pain; andWHEREAS, People who suffer from chronic pain often are stigmatized, marginalized, and not informed about the right to effective pain assessment and management, and most people with pain, including those at the end of life, get little or no relief; andWHEREAS, Women have a higher prevalence than men of syndromes and diseases associated with chronic pain, such as fibromyalgia, complex pain syndrome, and osteoarthritis, and women respond differently to certain analgesics; andWHEREAS, Womens pain reports are taken less seriously than those of men, and women receive less aggressive treatment than men for their pain; andWHEREAS, Women have developed a number of coping mechanisms to deal with pain, and this may contribute to a general perception that they can endure more pain and that their pain does not need to be taken as seriously; andWHEREAS, Women more frequently report pain to a health care provider, but are more likely to have their pain reports discounted as emotional or psychogenic and, therefore, not real; andWHEREAS, The California-based Partners for Understanding Pain is a coalition of pain sufferers, physicians, nurses, social workers, pharmacists, therapists, civic leaders, nonprofit organizations, and health care businesses whose mission is to improve the quality of life for people in California experiencing pain; andWHEREAS, It is the collective mission of this movement to provide practical information for people with pain, inform health care professionals about pain management, and serve as an advocate for people experiencing pain; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby recognizes and declares the month of September 2019 as Pain Awareness Month, and calls upon all Californians to observe the month by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities, and by learning how to improve the quality of life for people in California suffering from pain; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate recognizes September 1, 2019, as Women In Pain Awareness Day to draw public attention to the important need to raise awareness concerning gender disparities in pain assessment and treatment in the United States; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 09, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 65Introduced by Senator JacksonAugust 30, 2019 Relative to pain awareness. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 65, Jackson. Digest Key

 Enrolled  September 09, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2019

Enrolled  September 09, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 65

Introduced by Senator JacksonAugust 30, 2019

Introduced by Senator Jackson
August 30, 2019

 Relative to pain awareness. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 65, Jackson. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, More than 100 million Americans live with chronic pain caused by various diseases or disorders, and nearly 25 million Americans suffer with acute pain each year; and

WHEREAS, Though medical knowledge and technology exist to relieve or greatly ease pain, most pain is untreated, undertreated, or improperly treated, and many health care professionals are still unaware of how to effectively treat pain; and

WHEREAS, People who suffer from chronic pain often are stigmatized, marginalized, and not informed about the right to effective pain assessment and management, and most people with pain, including those at the end of life, get little or no relief; and

WHEREAS, Women have a higher prevalence than men of syndromes and diseases associated with chronic pain, such as fibromyalgia, complex pain syndrome, and osteoarthritis, and women respond differently to certain analgesics; and

WHEREAS, Womens pain reports are taken less seriously than those of men, and women receive less aggressive treatment than men for their pain; and

WHEREAS, Women have developed a number of coping mechanisms to deal with pain, and this may contribute to a general perception that they can endure more pain and that their pain does not need to be taken as seriously; and

WHEREAS, Women more frequently report pain to a health care provider, but are more likely to have their pain reports discounted as emotional or psychogenic and, therefore, not real; and

WHEREAS, The California-based Partners for Understanding Pain is a coalition of pain sufferers, physicians, nurses, social workers, pharmacists, therapists, civic leaders, nonprofit organizations, and health care businesses whose mission is to improve the quality of life for people in California experiencing pain; and

WHEREAS, It is the collective mission of this movement to provide practical information for people with pain, inform health care professionals about pain management, and serve as an advocate for people experiencing pain; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby recognizes and declares the month of September 2019 as Pain Awareness Month, and calls upon all Californians to observe the month by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities, and by learning how to improve the quality of life for people in California suffering from pain; and be it further

Resolved, That the Senate recognizes September 1, 2019, as Women In Pain Awareness Day to draw public attention to the important need to raise awareness concerning gender disparities in pain assessment and treatment in the United States; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.