LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR66
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR66
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR66
Action History
Senate
01/21/2020
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3117.)
Senate
01/14/2020
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3088.) (January 14).
Senate
01/10/2020
Set for hearing January 14.
Senate
01/09/2020
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
01/06/2020
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.