California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR68 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/28/2020

                            Enrolled  January 28, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  January 27, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 68Introduced by Senator Pan(Coauthor: Senator Chang)January 09, 2020 Relative to the Lunar New Year. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 68, Pan. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, January 25, 2020, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; andWHEREAS, California is home to over 5,000,000 Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 2,500,000 Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, The 2020 Lunar New Year is the Year of the Rat and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural diversity and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural tolerance; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating January 25, 2020, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extends best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  January 28, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  January 27, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 68Introduced by Senator Pan(Coauthor: Senator Chang)January 09, 2020 Relative to the Lunar New Year. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 68, Pan. Digest Key

 Enrolled  January 28, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  January 27, 2020

Enrolled  January 28, 2020
Passed IN  Senate  January 27, 2020

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 68

Introduced by Senator Pan(Coauthor: Senator Chang)January 09, 2020

Introduced by Senator Pan(Coauthor: Senator Chang)
January 09, 2020

 Relative to the Lunar New Year. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 68, Pan. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, January 25, 2020, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; and

WHEREAS, California is home to over 5,000,000 Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; and

WHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; and

WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 2,500,000 Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; and

WHEREAS, The 2020 Lunar New Year is the Year of the Rat and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; and

WHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural diversity and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural tolerance; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating January 25, 2020, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extends best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.