LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR7
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR7
Action History
Senate
01/22/2019
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 96.)
Senate
01/17/2019
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 85.) (January 17).
Senate
01/16/2019
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
01/14/2019
Set for hearing January 17 in JUD. pending receipt.
Senate
01/07/2019
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
12/03/2018
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.