LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR72
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR72
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR72
Action History
Senate
03/18/2020
March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Senate
03/16/2020
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
03/11/2020
Set for hearing March 24.
Senate
02/06/2020
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
01/28/2020
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.