Senate | 03/25/2019 | March 25 hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Set for hearing March 25. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | March 11 hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Set for hearing March 11. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |