California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR82 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/16/2020

                            Enrolled  June 16, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  June 11, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 82Introduced by Senators McGuire, Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Grove, Hurtado, Jackson, Leyva, Mitchell, Rubio, and SkinnerMarch 11, 2020 Relative to National Rosie the Riveter Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 82, McGuire. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, National Rosie the Riveter Day is a collective national effort to raise awareness of the 16 million women working during World War II; and WHEREAS, Californians have chosen to honor female workers who contributed on the homefront during World War II; andWHEREAS, These women left their homes to work or volunteer full time in factories, farms, shipyards, airplane factories, banks, and other institutions in support of the military overseas; and WHEREAS, These women worked with the United Service Organizations (USO) and the American Red Cross, drove trucks, riveted airplane parts, collected critical materials, rolled bandages, and served on rationing boards; and WHEREAS, It is fitting and proper to recognize and preserve the history and legacy of working women, including volunteer women, during World War II to promote cooperation and fellowship among these women and their descendants; and WHEREAS, These women and their descendants wish to further the advancement of patriotic ideals, excellence in the workplace, and loyalty to the United States of America; and WHEREAS, March 21, 2020, during Womens History Month, would be an appropriate date to designate as National Rosie the Riveter Day; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Legislature recognizes March 21, 2020, as National Rosie the Riveter Day and honors the 16 million women who worked during World War II for their dedication and sacrifice; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 16, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  June 11, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 82Introduced by Senators McGuire, Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Grove, Hurtado, Jackson, Leyva, Mitchell, Rubio, and SkinnerMarch 11, 2020 Relative to National Rosie the Riveter Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 82, McGuire. Digest Key

 Enrolled  June 16, 2020 Passed IN  Senate  June 11, 2020

Enrolled  June 16, 2020
Passed IN  Senate  June 11, 2020

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 82

Introduced by Senators McGuire, Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Grove, Hurtado, Jackson, Leyva, Mitchell, Rubio, and SkinnerMarch 11, 2020

Introduced by Senators McGuire, Atkins, Bates, Caballero, Durazo, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Grove, Hurtado, Jackson, Leyva, Mitchell, Rubio, and Skinner
March 11, 2020

 Relative to National Rosie the Riveter Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 82, McGuire. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, National Rosie the Riveter Day is a collective national effort to raise awareness of the 16 million women working during World War II; and 

WHEREAS, Californians have chosen to honor female workers who contributed on the homefront during World War II; and

WHEREAS, These women left their homes to work or volunteer full time in factories, farms, shipyards, airplane factories, banks, and other institutions in support of the military overseas; and 

WHEREAS, These women worked with the United Service Organizations (USO) and the American Red Cross, drove trucks, riveted airplane parts, collected critical materials, rolled bandages, and served on rationing boards; and 

WHEREAS, It is fitting and proper to recognize and preserve the history and legacy of working women, including volunteer women, during World War II to promote cooperation and fellowship among these women and their descendants; and 

WHEREAS, These women and their descendants wish to further the advancement of patriotic ideals, excellence in the workplace, and loyalty to the United States of America; and 

WHEREAS, March 21, 2020, during Womens History Month, would be an appropriate date to designate as National Rosie the Riveter Day; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Legislature recognizes March 21, 2020, as National Rosie the Riveter Day and honors the 16 million women who worked during World War II for their dedication and sacrifice; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.