Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 3. Page 1589.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|