|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2920.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2452.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1612.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|