California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1020 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill August 16, 2021
Bill July 1, 2021
Bill May 27, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021