California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2021

Amended

Bill June 30, 2021
Bill June 14, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021