|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 3070.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2569.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2339.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Rubio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2335.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 1532.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|