Assembly | 02/01/2022 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2021 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Berman. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | Read first time. To print. |