Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 4. Page 3404.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|