California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill June 29, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021