California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1115 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/18/2021

                            CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1115Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiFebruary 18, 2021 An act to amend Section 78043 of the Education Code, relating to public, postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1115, as introduced, Choi. Public postsecondary education: community colleges: statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program.Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law, until July 1, 2026, authorizes the board of governors, in consultation with the California State University and the University of California, to establish a statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program. Existing law requires a community college district baccalaureate degree pilot program to commence no later than the 201718 academic year, and requires students participating in a baccalaureate degree pilot program to commence their degrees by the beginning of the 202223 academic year.This bill would extend the operation of the statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program by one year, until July 1, 2027.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 78043 of the Education Code is amended to read:78043. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2026, 2027, and as of January 1, 2027, 2028, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2027, 2028, deletes or extends that date.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1115Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiFebruary 18, 2021 An act to amend Section 78043 of the Education Code, relating to public, postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1115, as introduced, Choi. Public postsecondary education: community colleges: statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program.Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law, until July 1, 2026, authorizes the board of governors, in consultation with the California State University and the University of California, to establish a statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program. Existing law requires a community college district baccalaureate degree pilot program to commence no later than the 201718 academic year, and requires students participating in a baccalaureate degree pilot program to commence their degrees by the beginning of the 202223 academic year.This bill would extend the operation of the statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program by one year, until July 1, 2027.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 1115

Introduced by Assembly Member ChoiFebruary 18, 2021

Introduced by Assembly Member Choi
February 18, 2021

 An act to amend Section 78043 of the Education Code, relating to public, postsecondary education. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1115, as introduced, Choi. Public postsecondary education: community colleges: statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program.

Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law, until July 1, 2026, authorizes the board of governors, in consultation with the California State University and the University of California, to establish a statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program. Existing law requires a community college district baccalaureate degree pilot program to commence no later than the 201718 academic year, and requires students participating in a baccalaureate degree pilot program to commence their degrees by the beginning of the 202223 academic year.This bill would extend the operation of the statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program by one year, until July 1, 2027.

Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law, until July 1, 2026, authorizes the board of governors, in consultation with the California State University and the University of California, to establish a statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program. Existing law requires a community college district baccalaureate degree pilot program to commence no later than the 201718 academic year, and requires students participating in a baccalaureate degree pilot program to commence their degrees by the beginning of the 202223 academic year.

This bill would extend the operation of the statewide baccalaureate degree pilot program by one year, until July 1, 2027.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 78043 of the Education Code is amended to read:78043. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2026, 2027, and as of January 1, 2027, 2028, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2027, 2028, deletes or extends that date.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 78043 of the Education Code is amended to read:78043. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2026, 2027, and as of January 1, 2027, 2028, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2027, 2028, deletes or extends that date.

SECTION 1. Section 78043 of the Education Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

78043. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2026, 2027, and as of January 1, 2027, 2028, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2027, 2028, deletes or extends that date.

78043. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2026, 2027, and as of January 1, 2027, 2028, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2027, 2028, deletes or extends that date.

78043. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2026, 2027, and as of January 1, 2027, 2028, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2027, 2028, deletes or extends that date.



78043. This article shall become inoperative on July 1, 2026, 2027, and as of January 1, 2027, 2028, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2027, 2028, deletes or extends that date.