California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2021

Amended

Bill August 18, 2021
Bill June 22, 2021
Bill June 14, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021