|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 712, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2880.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 2342.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1681.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|