California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1149 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2021

Amended

Bill June 8, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021