Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | Read first time. To print. |