|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 694, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2919.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2297.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1624.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/19/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/18/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|