|
07/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1632.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1541.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|