Assembly
|
01/10/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2021
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3021.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2491.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1615.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|