|
10/05/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2236.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1715.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1469.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|