07/09/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 45, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/09/2021 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/30/2021 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/24/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1632.). | ||
Senate | 06/22/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1334.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/19/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 18. | ||
Assembly | 12/18/2020 | Introduced. To print. |