California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1207 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Amended

Bill September 1, 2021
Bill July 6, 2021
Bill June 1, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021