California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1214 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Amended

Bill June 23, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021