Assembly
|
02/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2021
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2345.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
From special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1858.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1685.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|