Assembly | 02/01/2022 | Died on third reading file. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (January 20). | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |