California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1220 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill August 31, 2021
Bill June 24, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021