|
10/05/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 3112.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2534.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1721.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 20. Page 1849.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|