Senate | 08/26/2021 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2021 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 1692.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1734.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |