|
09/30/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2565.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 1543.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|