Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2021 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 14). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |