California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1280 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill August 18, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021