|
08/31/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2464.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2040.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1154.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|