Senate | 07/08/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 1893.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |