Assembly
|
02/01/2022
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on HUM. S.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1023.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on E.M. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|