Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1692.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|