Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |