Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3410.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|