California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1391 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2021

Amended

Bill August 16, 2021
Bill June 24, 2021
Bill June 16, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021