|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 7. Page 3060.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3050.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2564.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 7. Page 1830.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|