Assembly
|
02/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/05/2021
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 9. Page 3001.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 2503.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2393.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hueso.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 1282.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|