|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 945, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4975.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3427.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3396.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|