|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 858, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5184.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 3424.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (January 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2022
|
(pending re-refer to com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2022
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3242.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|