|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 17.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 3427.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 3397.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|