California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill July 8, 2021
Bill June 29, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021